THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:00:58 AM
Baribeau, Jean-Guy Yves
CPSO#:
33702
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Feb 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 May 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Baribeau, Joseph Jean-Guy Yves (used until: 14 Sep 1982 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: University of Ottawa, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1982 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Feb 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 15, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jean-Guy Yves Baribeau to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 15, 2019:
Dr. Baribeau was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct. After the allegations were referred to the Discipline Committee and prior to the hearing, Dr. Baribeau resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)