THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:06:51 PM
Bhangu, Dalip Kumar
CPSO#:
33690
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jan 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Lucknow, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487100
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Dalip Bhangu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 21 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:26 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DALIP KUMAR BHANGU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANGU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1982 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2020 |