THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:14:32 AM
Eisen, Joel Nathan
CPSO#:
33681
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jan 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jan 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding Boulevard
Suite 301
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 884-5387
Fax: (905) 884-5387
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOEL NATHAN EISEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1987 |