THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:42:53 AM
Dy Pac, Emily Tan
CPSO#:
33664
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Aug 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Fukien
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Timmins and District Hospitals, 425 Algonquin Boulevard East, Timmins, ON, P4N 1B5. 700 Ross Avenue East, Timmins, ON, P4N 8P2
Date Received: 24 Oct 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Oct 2016 |