THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:04:00 AM
Abrahamson, Simon Denis
CPSO#:
33649
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
6 Donnelly South
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIMON DENIS ABRAHAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAMSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 1986 |