THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:12:26 PM
Stechison, Michael Thomas
CPSO#:
33647
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Aug 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Stechison Neurosurgery Atlanta
P.O. Box 54681
Atlanta GA 30308
Date Received: 06 Jul 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Georgia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:06 Dec 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2018 |