THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:47:58 AM
Khan, Naeem Asif Hussain
CPSO#:
33637
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Osmania University, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Mar 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Dec 2022 |