THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:43:20 AM
Chalhoub, Sarkis
CPSO#:
33634
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
16 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jul 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
27-Nov-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sarkis Chalhoub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 18 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to their medical records can contact:
RSRS at Tel: 1-888-563-3732, Fax: 416-398-5932
Date Received: 30 Aug 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 16 Aug 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 4, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Sarkis Chalhoub passed away on November 27, 2018 (SCERP – incomplete).
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)