THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:20:57 AM
Goldberg, Ronn Elliott Aron
CPSO#:
33629
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Apr 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Apr 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Ext. 6186
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RONN ELLIOTT ARON GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 1988 |