THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:17:15 AM
McIlraith, Duncan Mcleod
CPSO#:
33618
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: (613) 907-8003
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:24 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DUNCAN MCLEOD MCILRAITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCILRAITH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1989 |