THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:55:06 AM
Smith, Bryan Vincent
CPSO#:
33605
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jul 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Bryan Vincent Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:8 Balding Cres
Ottawa ON K2K 2L4
Date Received: 13 Jun 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: July 8, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On July 14, 2014, Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital notified the College that Dr. B.V. Smith's privileges were voluntarily restricted.
Source: Hospital
Active Date: June 26, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On July 2, 2014, Queensway Carleton Hospital notified the College that Dr. B.V. Smith's privileges were voluntarily restricted.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jun 2019 |