THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:51:32 AM
Turnbull, John Douglas
CPSO#:
33602
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Room 4U7
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76365
Fax: (905) 521-2656
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Katherine Parlee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:19 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS TURNBULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNBULL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1982 |