THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:58:33 AM
Edington, Richard Bruce
CPSO#:
33587
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Bruce Edington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 29 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hanover Medical Associates,
118-7th Ave.
Hanover,ON
N4N 2G9
Date Received: 03 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 May 2022 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On February 20, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in London, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Richard B Edington in respect of an incident that took place in December 2008.