THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 18:18:22 PM
Perez, Francisco Eduardo
CPSO#:
33569
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
08 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Central Del Ecuador Quito, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 08 Dec 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 20, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)