THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:10:17 PM
Madison, Vera Victoria
CPSO#:
33558
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Mar 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Median, Vera Vukovic (used until: 14 Sep 1989 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Spanish
Education: University of Belgrade, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 21 Mar 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Aug 2019 |