THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:50:02 AM
Whitehead, Jeffrey John
CPSO#:
33509
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Feb 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kathleen Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:5 Garand Place
Ottawa, ON K1H 8M1
Date Received: 18 Mar 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Community Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2022 |