THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:51:59 PM
Ross, Bobbie
CPSO#:
33506
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Ross, Barbara McNichol (used until: 04 Dec 2019 )
Stanford, Barbara Mcnichol (used until: 14 Apr 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1611 Nickleplate Road
Suite 303
Rossland BC V0G 1Y0
Phone: 506-850-4028
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Barbara Ross Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BOBBIE ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jul 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2012 |