THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:05:55 AM
Garrioch, Gregory Francis
CPSO#:
33499
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1935 Paris St
Sudbury ON P3E 3C6
Phone: 705 662 3852
Electoral District: 08
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records will be held by: ODS
PO Box 2071
Sudbury, Ontario
P3A 4R8
Toll free: 1-877-560-4ODS
Tel: 705-560-8461
Fax: 705-524-8012
Date Received: 12 Feb 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jan 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY FRANCIS GARRIOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARRIOCH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1982 |