THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:00:26 AM
Hollinger, Charles Gerald
CPSO#:
33496
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gerald Hollinger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking records from the Guelph Sleep Clinic may contact the above.
RSRS
111 St. Regie Cr S
North York ON M3J 1Y6
Phone : 416 398 0638
Date Received: 26 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2023 |