THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 23:38:53 PM
Fraser, Ian Murray
CPSO#:
33484
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto East Health Network
Chest Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-7777
Fax: (416) 469-7717
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:01 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IAN MURRAY FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1982 |