THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 8:51:29 AM
Beharry, Rajendra
CPSO#:
33482
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jan 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Jamaican Creole
Education: University of the West Indies, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
567 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5S 2P8
Phone: (416) 964-8572
Fax: (416) 323-1662
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJENDRA BEHARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHARRY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2024 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: June 18, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)