THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:07:33 PM
Armstrong, Barry Donald
CPSO#:
33481
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Calgary, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Barry D. Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:14 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 01 Nov 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 05 Mar 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 26 Feb 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2021 |