THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:56:36 AM
Choi, Tat-Hung Jacob
CPSO#:
33479
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Tat Hung Choi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
3 Marlborough Street
Richmond Hill, ON L4B 2W7
Date Received: 05 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2017 |