THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 12:37:55 PM
Rutherford, Susan Mildred
CPSO#:
33473
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 May 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
14-1450 O'Connor Dr
Toronto ON M4B 2T8
Phone: (416) 699-9035
Fax: (416) 699-9063
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:20 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSAN MILDRED RUTHERFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUTHERFORD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 1985 |