THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:17:04 PM
Davis, Michael Garson
CPSO#:
33464
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
26 Nov 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
26-Nov-2021
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michael G. Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 7 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:22 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 26 Nov 2021 |