THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:39:58 AM
Morrison, Laurie Jean
CPSO#:
33450
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Nov 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Nov 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
1175 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 524-5434
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAURIE JEAN MORRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 1987 |