THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 1:25:35 AM
Barabtarlo, Jack
CPSO#:
33416
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jan 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Apr 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 505
15 Wertheim Court
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3H7
Phone: (905) 882-7828
Fax: (905) 882-9248
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 May 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACK BARABTARLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARABTARLO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2003 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2003 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 31 Jan 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2004 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Sep 2003
Summary:
On September 3, 2003 the Discipline Committee found Dr. Barabtarlo to have committed an act of professional misconduct in that he had been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.
On September 4, 2003, the Discipline Committee ordered the following:
1) Dr. Jack Barabtarlo attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.
2) The registrar suspend Dr. Barabtarlo(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, effective on a date to be fixed by the Registrar, with the period of suspension to commence no later than October 31, 2003.
3) The Registrar impose a term, condition and limitation on Dr. Barabtarlo(s cetificate of registration that Dr. Barabtarlo refrain from directly billing OHIP for a period of six (6) consectutive months commencing from the date the suspension of Dr. Barabtarlo comes into force.
4) Dr. Barabtarlo pay costs to the College in the amoung of $2500.00 by October 31, 2003.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 03, 2003