THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:13:08 PM
Lee, Shui Hing
CPSO#:
33413
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of New South Wales Faculty of, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 255
4231 Hazelbridge Way
Richmond BC V6X 3L7
Phone: (604) 273-6767
Fax: (604) 273-6730
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
USA - North Dakota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:20 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 24 Sep 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 24 Sep 2014 |
|
Active |