THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:06:21 PM
Morley-Forster, Patricia Kathleen
CPSO#:
33388
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jun 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Morley-Forster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 26 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Health Records
St Joseph HealthCare
London ON
Phone # (519) 646-6100
Date Received: 29 May 2019
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their records may contact: St Joseph's Health Centre c/o Pain Clinic, Room B3-628, 268 Grosvenor Street, London, ON, N6A 4V2
Date Received: 26 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:09 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1977 to 15 Jun 1978
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Mar 1999
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2019 |