THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 3:35:44 AM
Gordon, David George
CPSO#:
33361
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
03 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jun 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2005 |