THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:26:21 PM
Blitzer, Steve Arthur
CPSO#:
33351
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hebrew
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Royal Orchard Boulevard at Yonge
Thornhill ON L3T 3C3
Phone: (905) 881-1661
Fax: (905) 881-1710
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVE ARTHUR BLITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLITZER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Sep 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1985 |