THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:41:46 PM
Taylor, Edward Kent
CPSO#:
33349
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
604-700 Dorval Dr
Oakville ON L6K 3V3
Phone: 905-582-2299
Fax: 905-582-0880
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:18 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDWARD KENT TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2020 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On July 16, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Milton, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Taylor.