THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 13:48:20 PM
Tang, Hung-Yip
CPSO#:
33347
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jun 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Hung-Yip Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS Inc
111 St.Regis Crescent S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 30 Apr 2019
Instructions/Address:
Records Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Cres S
Toronto ON M3Y 1Y6
Tel: 416.398.0638
Toll free: 1.888.563.3732
Date Received: 07 Feb 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On March 30, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, in Newmarket, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Tang.