THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 4:48:31 AM
Chepesiuk, Martin Andrew
CPSO#:
33346
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571 Ext. 6765
Fax: 905-338-4372
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:21 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN ANDREW CHEPESIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEPESIUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 May 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2022 |