THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:19:26 AM
Burke, Bruce Reginald
CPSO#:
33326
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 21084 Mapleridge
Peterborough ON
Peterborough ON K9J 8M7
Phone: 705-874-1344
Fax: 705-874-1344
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: B. R. Burke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Dec 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRUCE REGINALD BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |