THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:43:36 AM
Brown, Donald Stephen
CPSO#:
33325
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Room 3404B
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7001
Fax: (613) 696-7116
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONALD STEPHEN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Sep 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1992 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 20 Nov 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2013 |