THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 17:12:51 PM
Liberman, Bruce Alan
CPSO#:
33295
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
21 Mar 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2011 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 21 Mar 2012 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 May 2011
Summary:
On May 4, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Liberman committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Committee also found that Dr. Liberman is incompetent regarding his post-operative care of a liposuction patient.
Regarding 55 patients at two cosmetic clinics, the Committee found that Dr. Liberman failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in not charting the vital signs of the patients on admission to the recovery room.
Regarding the post-operative care of a liposuction patient and charting regarding this patient, the Committee found that Dr. Liberman failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct: in his failure to aggressively treat the patient's hypovolemia; in his failure to call 911 when his initial treatment failed, and later when the patient became unconscious; in his failure to chart the initial recovery room vital signs and failure to chart his intervention prior to intubation. He also engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct when he removed his September 20, 2007, resuscitation note from the chart and replaced it with a note written the next day, and with regard to his misleading statements on the replacement resuscitation note. The Committee also found Dr. Liberman incompetent in his post-operative care of this patient.
On March 21, 2012, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar revoke Dr. Liberman's certificate of registration, effective as of the date of this Order.
2. Dr. Liberman appear before the Panel to be reprimanded, on a date to be fixed by the Panel, which shall be no later than three months from the date that this Order becomes final.
3. Dr. Liberman pay costs to the College in the amount of $62,050, within 6 months of the date of this order
On April 19, 2012, Dr. Liberman appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court. In the circumstances, the decision of the Discipline Committee remains in effect despite the appeal.
On June 13, 2013, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Liberman's appeal in its entirety.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2013-06-13
Hearing Date(s): June 14-18, June 28 & 30, July 19-23, September 15
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: July 29, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Bruce Alan Liberman, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).
A. PREAMBLE
(1) I, Dr. Liberman, certificate of registration number 33295, was a member of the College between June 15, 1982 and March 21, 2012. My certificate of registration was revoked by the Discipline Committee of the College on March 21, 2012.
B. UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(2) I, Dr. Liberman, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
(3) I, Dr. Liberman, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(4) I, Dr. Liberman, consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.