THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 19:43:14 PM
Chan, Vincent Wing Suen
CPSO#:
33294
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
18 Norden Cres
North York ON M3B 1B6
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent W.S. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 3 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2023 |