THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:07:58 PM
Salo, Rosaline
CPSO#:
33265
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 May 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rosaline Salo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 21 2014
Corporation Name: Rosaline Salo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |