THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:17:35 AM
Hughes, Edward George
CPSO#:
33249
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Dec 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Liverpool School of Medici, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
One Fertility
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON L7N 3T1
Phone: (905) 634-4440
Fax: (905) 639-3810
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Edward and Frances Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:25 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDWARD GEORGE HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 1984 |