THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 14:16:26 PM
Ramsdale, Elizabeth Helen
CPSO#:
33247
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 May 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Di, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
111 St Regis Cres S
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 24 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:03 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |