THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 7:34:47 AM
Ludwin, David
CPSO#:
33237
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 May 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Ludwin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:St Josephs Hospital, 50 Charlton Avenue East, Hamilton, ON, L8N 4A6
Date Received: 05 Dec 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:15 Sep 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2017 |