THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:35:20 AM
Lawton, Louis Joseph
CPSO#:
33234
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Oct 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Oct 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1125 Colonel By Dr
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
Phone: 613-261-9168
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lawton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:CHEO
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa On K1H 8L1
Date Received: 31 Mar 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:23 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LOUIS JOSEPH LAWTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWTON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2022 |