THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:36:37 AM
Bodkin, Robert Norman
CPSO#:
33232
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Apr 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 May 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Norman Bodkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 3 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr Doyin Okoye
535 BELMONT AVE
SUITE 205
KITCHENER ONT
N2M 5E9
Date Received: 17 May 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Apr 2024 |