THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:02:15 AM
Langer, Jacob Charles
CPSO#:
33213
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Div of General & Thoracic Surgery
Room 1524
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6405
Fax: (416) 813-7477
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Missouri
USA - Ohio
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatric General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACOB CHARLES LANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 1988 |