THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:59:13 PM
Roberts, David Kenneth
CPSO#:
33202
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 May 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. D. Kenneth Roberts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 24 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DOCUdavit
40 ASHWARREN RD. NORTH YORK, ON M3J 1Z5
Date Received: 26 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:19 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 May 2022 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On October 9, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Newmarket, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. David K Roberts in respect of an incident that took place in March 2009.