THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:06:07 AM
Bradford, John Philip
CPSO#:
33201
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Apr 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: JP Bradford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:written requests for copies of medical recordsshould be forwarded to the address above
Unit 301, 720 Guelph Line, Burlington, ON L7R 4E2
Date Received: 11 May 2015
Instructions/Address:
P O Box 62006
Burlington Mall ON L7R 3N0
Date Received: 08 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 1982 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 28 Apr 2004 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 Aug 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2015 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 May 2004
Summary:
On May 25, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bradford to have committed an act of professional misconduct in that he committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional for conducting an operation without the patient(s consent.
The Committee ordered the following:
1) That Dr. Bradford be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.
2) That Dr. Bradford be suspended for one month commencing on July 1, 2004, and;
3) that Dr. Bradford pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 25, 2004
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Aug 2002
Summary:
On August 26, 2002, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Bradford committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, for an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Bradford to attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding be included in the register.
The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Bradford(s certificate of registration for a period of one month starting on the following date: October 1, 2003.
The Discipline Committee orders the suspension of the one month suspension if Dr. Bradford takes at his own expense and successfully completes the following courses approved by the College: (a) medical record-keeping; (b) physician-patient communications; and (c) medical ethics and informed consent. The courses must be completed no later than the following date: September 30, 2003.
The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Bradford to pay part of the College(s costs to the College, fixed in the amount of $2,500.00 by the following date: November 30, 2002.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 26, 2002