THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 7:13:01 AM
Prendergast, Peter Jude
CPSO#:
33174
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member - CPSO Staff as of
07 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
80 College St
Toronto ON M5P 2X7
Phone: 6475054019
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Prendergast Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 30 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER JUDE PRENDERGAST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRENDERGAST is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 1982 |