THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 17:19:49 PM
Hood, Nancy Anne
CPSO#:
33172
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Feb 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Nov 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Carmichael Hood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:245 Eglington Ave E
Toronto ON M4P 3B7
Date Received: 27 Feb 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Dec 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Feb 2019 |