THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 2:58:17 AM
Boyd, Cameron Lindsay
CPSO#:
33171
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Cameron Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON K9J 7B3
Date Received: 23 Dec 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 1982 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2016 |